OK SB503 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; authorizing Oklahoma Tax Commission to prohibit issuance of replacement plates for license plate siezed. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; authorizing Oklahoma Tax Commission to prohibit issuance of replacement plates for license plate siezed. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 1
2014-05-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2014-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
2014-05-21SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2014-05-21SenateEmergency added
2014-05-21SenateCCR read, GCCA
2014-05-16HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2014-05-13SenateSCs named GCCA
2014-05-13SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-05-12Senateremove as principal author Representative Matthews and substitute with Representative Christian
2014-05-12SenateRemove as author Senator Shumate; authored by Brooks
2013-04-23Senatecoauthored by Shelton
2013-04-23SenateHAs read
2013-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11
2013-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2013-04-11HouseTitle restored
2013-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2013-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2013-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2013-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-02-05SenateTitle stricken
2013-02-05Senatecoauthored by Matthews (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Shumate
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47110423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711352New CodeSee Bill Text
4711353New CodeSee Bill Text
4711355New CodeSee Bill Text
477606New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback