OK SB503 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - coauthored by Shelton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - coauthored by Shelton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; providing for special license plates. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; providing for special license plates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-11 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Matthews (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shumate |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1104 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1135 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1135 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |