OK SB500 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; relating to motor carriers; expanding exemption for certain permit. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Public safety; relating to motor carriers; expanding exemption for certain permit. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Tibbs (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-02-10 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |