OK SB499 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public health; providing for the creation of hospital trusts; setting forth provisions related to taxation; authorizing trusts to seek certain waivers. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health; providing for the creation of hospital trusts; setting forth provisions related to taxation; authorizing trusts to seek certain waivers. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateConferees unable to agree
2019-05-21HouseHC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Rules and naming ODonnell, Taylor, Kiger, Kannady, Echols, West (Josh), Pfeiffer, Fugate, Dunnington
2019-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-03SenateSCs named Standridge, Dahm, Hall, Pederson, Floyd, Young
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Finance Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback