OK SB499 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-05 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Council on Judicial Complaints; relating to dual office holding; providing exemption. Effective date.
Title
Council on Judicial Complaints; relating to dual office holding; providing exemption. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | Approved by Governor 04/02/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-03-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-03-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 16 | |
2010-03-30 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary committee | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | coauthored by Duncan (principal House author) | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |