OK SB492 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Vulnerable adults; modifying certain provisions related to emergency protective services for vulnerable adults. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vulnerable adults; modifying certain provisions related to emergency protective services for vulnerable adults. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 To Senate
2011-05-19 Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1
2011-05-19 Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-18 CCR submitted
2011-05-18 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 CCR adopted, GCCA
2011-05-17 Title restored
2011-05-17 CCR read, GCCA
2011-05-11 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services
2011-05-10 SCs named GCCA
2011-05-09 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-27 HAs read
2011-04-27 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-26 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
2011-04-26 Amended
2011-04-26 General Order
2011-04-12 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee
2011-03-22 Second Reading referred to Human Services
2011-03-21 First Reading
2011-03-21 Engrossed to House
2011-03-16 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-16 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-03-16 General Order, Considered
2011-03-03 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman
2011-02-28 coauthored by Grau (principal House author)
2011-02-28 Title stricken
2011-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2011-02-22 Referred to Appropriations
2011-02-22 Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Burrage
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43A10108New CodeSee Bill Text
43A5213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback