OK SB488 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisoners; creating the Inmate Farm Worker Act. Effective date.
Title
Prisoners; creating the Inmate Farm Worker Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Paddack [D] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2013-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paddack |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |