OK SB481 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Special license plates; creating the Oklahoma Tennis Foundation license plate.
Title
Special license plates; creating the Oklahoma Tennis Foundation license plate.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB481 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author)