OK SB48 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB48
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County officers and public records; updating language regarding storage of records; county audits; publication on website. Emergency.
Title
County officers and public records; updating language regarding storage of records; county audits; publication on website. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0; Ayes: 72 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB48 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 130 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 155 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 174 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |