OK SB478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB478
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Health Care Choice Act; authorizes buying insurance across state lines.
Title
Insurance; creating the Health Care Choice Act; authorizes buying insurance across state lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-17 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Brown, Leewright, Griffin, Paxton, Dahm, Sparks, Matthews |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2017-05-08 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2017-04-27 | House | Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-12 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brecheen |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB478 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017