OK SB478 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; modifying requirements for child care facility liability insurance. Emergency.
Title
Children; modifying requirements for child care facility liability insurance. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-30 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-30 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-30 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-15 | HAs read | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2009-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-04-14 | General Order | |
2009-03-25 | Emergency added | |
2009-03-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-02-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-18 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2009-02-18 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-09 | coauthored by Peters (principal House author) | |
2009-02-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-09 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Peters | |
2009-02-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Resources | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |