OK SB477 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County officer training programs; requiring certain training programs. Emergency.
Title
County officer training programs; requiring certain training programs. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 10 |
2015-04-13 | House | General Order |
2015-04-01 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2015-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |