OK SB47 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Department of Public Safety; modifying positions and salary schedules; allowing certain promotions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Department of Public Safety; modifying positions and salary schedules; allowing certain promotions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 12 |
2015-04-13 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (principal House author) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |