OK SB461 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB461
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Failed in Committee - Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Failed in Committee - Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax; authorizing vendor deduction of sales and use tax due for certain expenses. Effective date.
Title
Sales and use tax; authorizing vendor deduction of sales and use tax due for certain expenses. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: FAILED (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Finance |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Boren |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB461 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Failed in Committee - Finance