OK SB461 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to tax incentives for tourism attractions and film, digital media production or music production and development facility projects; limiting amount of extensions of credits; stating requirements. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to tax incentives for tourism attractions and film, digital media production or music production and development facility projects; limiting amount of extensions of credits; stating requirements. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Samson Buck [D] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] |
Sen. Todd Lamb [R] | Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Jonathan Nichols [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-04 | coauthored by Nichols, Lamb, Gumm | |
2010-05-04 | Remove as author Senator Nichols; authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2010-05-04 | HAs adopted | |
2010-05-04 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Nichols, Lamb | |
2010-05-04 | Pending removal author Senator Nichols and replace with Senator Mazzei | |
2010-05-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Gumm | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2010-04-20 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17 | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 16 | |
2010-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Buck, Cox | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Emergency added | |
2010-04-12 | Title restored | |
2010-04-12 | Remove Representative Terrill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hickman | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Nichols | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2357 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 22 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |