OK SB460 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child abuse; requiring DHS to electronically record hotline referrals. Effective date.
Title
Child abuse; requiring DHS to electronically record hotline referrals. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 61 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 15 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 61 Nays: 19 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-07 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Human Services |
2013-05-06 | Senate | SCs named Griffin, Crain, Treat, Johnson (Constance), Standridge, McAffrey |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-04-15 | House | General Order |
2013-04-02 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |