OK SB459 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; requiring director to be appointed by Governor and confirmed by Senate; abolishing the Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services and transferring duties to the director. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; requiring director to be appointed by Governor and confirmed by Senate; abolishing the Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services and transferring duties to the director. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Ford
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Wright
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Wallace
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Kannady
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Hill
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Kerbs
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Sims
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Gann
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Baker
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Patzkowsky
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Luttrell
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Boatman
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Grego
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Smith
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Taylor
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Phillips
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh)
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Stark
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Talley
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Mize
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Townley
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Boles
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative May
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Pae
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Fincher
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Miller
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Dills
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Manger
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Randleman
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Kiger
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Sterling
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Strom
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Cornwell
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Burns
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Olsen
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Steagall
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Vancuren
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Frix
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Conley
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Lawson
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateEmergency added
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Simpson
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback