OK SB457 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Child competency proceedings; establishing procedures for certain proceedings. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child competency proceedings; establishing procedures for certain proceedings. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateApproved by Governor 06/05/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
2015-05-21HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2015-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-19SenateEnacting clause restored
2015-05-19SenateTitle restored
2015-05-19SenateCCR read
2015-05-05HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure
2015-04-30SenateSCs named Griffin, Sykes, David, Treat, Yen, Floyd, Sparks
2015-04-29SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-21SenateHAs read
2015-04-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2015-04-20HouseGeneral Order
2015-03-24HouseEnacting clause stricken
2015-03-24HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2015-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2015-03-03Senatecoauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
2015-02-17SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-17SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Griffin
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10A22Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb457&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB457%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB457%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB457%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB457%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB457%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB457%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB457_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB457_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback