OK SB456 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB456
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Offenders; modifying eligibility for electronic monitoring. Effective date.
Title
Offenders; modifying eligibility for electronic monitoring. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20 |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB456 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2021