OK SB456 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB456
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor 03/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor 03/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; appointing administrator; modifying membership of the Oklahoma Health Care Authority Board; providing for the removal of the administrator. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; appointing administrator; modifying membership of the Oklahoma Health Care Authority Board; providing for the removal of the administrator. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 03/13/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 23 |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) David |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy), Roberts (Sean), Wright, Ford |
2019-03-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Luttrell |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Smith |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Phillips |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Taylor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stark |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Talley |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative May |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fincher |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dills |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Marti |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Manger |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kiger |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cornwell |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sterling |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strom |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Olsen |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Randleman |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Vancuren |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lawson |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency added |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB456 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor 03/13/2019