OK SB456 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courthouse security; authorizing addition of certain fee for specified purpose. Effective date.
Title
Courthouse security; authorizing addition of certain fee for specified purpose. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2015 |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 26 |
2015-04-16 | House | Amended |
2015-04-16 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-04-16 | House | General Order |
2015-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Osborn and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 22 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |