OK SB454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - coauthored by Bell
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans' treatment programs; directing development and implementation of certain programs. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' treatment programs; directing development and implementation of certain programs. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24Senatecoauthored by Bell
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author)
2019-02-12SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-12SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Newhouse
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback