OK SB45 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB45
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School employees; requiring school district boards of education to adopt certain code of principles. Effective date.
Title
School employees; requiring school district boards of education to adopt certain code of principles. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 27 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB45 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 27