OK SB45 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB45
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Educator contracts; allowing the State Department of Education to contract with educators for certain services. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Educator contracts; allowing the State Department of Education to contract with educators for certain services. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9; Ayes: 79 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-17 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB45 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |