OK SB444 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB444
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; modifying provisions relating to precinct election boards and officials. Effective dates.
Title
Elections; modifying provisions relating to precinct election boards and officials. Effective dates.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Rep. Matt Meredith [D] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 14 |
2019-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-02 | Senate | SCs named Jech, McCortney, Daniels, Paxton, Kirt, Ikley-Freeman |
2019-04-23 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2019-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 32 |
2019-04-18 | House | Amended |
2019-04-18 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2019-04-18 | House | General Order |
2019-03-26 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp |
2019-03-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Meredith |
2019-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB444 (Carry Over) 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019