OK SB442 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Fees; increasing certain fee for records preservation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees; increasing certain fee for records preservation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-10SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-10HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-09HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
2019-04-09HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Roberts (Dustin)
2019-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-25HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2019-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Haste
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback