OK SB442 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Rereferred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Texting while driving; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; providing exceptions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting while driving; making certain acts unlawful; providing penalties; providing exceptions. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-12SenateRereferred to Public Safety
2014-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2014-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2014-02-04Senatecoauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Sharp
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711901dAmended CodeSee Bill Text
4711901eAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback