OK SB441 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; school calendar; allowing school districts to adopt school-hours policy with a minimum number of school days. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; school calendar; allowing school districts to adopt school-hours policy with a minimum number of school days. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22HouseTo Senate
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 32
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
2019-05-20SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateCCR read
2019-05-17HouseHC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Rules and naming O'Donnell, Taylor, Kiger, Kannady, Echols, West (Josh), Pfeiffer, Fugate, Dunnington
2019-05-15HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-15SenateSCs named Quinn, Treat, David, Thompson, Smalley, Floyd, Brooks
2019-05-15SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-25SenateHAs read
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 30
2019-04-24HouseMotion to divide the question failed
2019-04-24HouseMotion to suspend rule failed
2019-04-24HouseAmended
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dills
2019-04-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-04-17HouseWithdrawn from Calendar; referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 17
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Stanislawski
2019-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
2019-02-19SenateEmergency removed
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Quinn
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb441&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB441%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB441%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB441%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB441%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB441%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB441%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB441%20HCS1.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB441%20HFLR1.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB441%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB441%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB441%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB441_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB441_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback