OK SB441 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; providing assessment for agricultural equipment tires. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Environment and natural resources; providing assessment for agricultural equipment tires. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-28 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 12 | |
2010-04-19 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-19 | Laid over | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-05 | Title restored | |
2010-04-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jackson | |
2010-04-05 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-12 | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) | |
2009-02-12 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2009-02-12 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-12 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ivester | |
2009-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) McNiel | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 2 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |