OK SB435 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Education Board - modifying appointments to the Board.
Title
Education Board - modifying appointments to the Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Kris Steele [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 53 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 55 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-17 | To Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 33 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-16 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 | |
2011-05-16 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-10 | CCR read | |
2011-04-26 | Conference granted, naming: Conference Committee on Education | |
2011-04-13 | HAs rejected, conference requested, SCs named Bingman, Ford, Stanislawski, Jolley, Eason McIntyre, Sparks | |
2011-04-07 | HAs read | |
2011-04-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 35; Ayes: 58 Nays: 39 | |
2011-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright | |
2011-04-06 | General Order | |
2011-03-30 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-02-22 | First Reading | |
2011-02-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-21 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15 | |
2011-02-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 16 | |
2011-02-21 | coauthored by Shortey, Holt | |
2011-02-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Steele (principal House author) | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by David | |
2011-02-15 | coauthored by Ford | |
2011-02-15 | Remove as author Senator Ford; authored by Senator Bingman | |
2011-02-15 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Education | |
2011-02-14 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ford | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 5 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |