OK SB434 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid; creating I/T/U Shared Savings Program; providing for certain reimbursement; specifying criteria for care coordination agreements. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid; creating I/T/U Shared Savings Program; providing for certain reimbursement; specifying criteria for care coordination agreements. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-10SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2021-02-01SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback