OK SB430 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB430
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Infrastructure development; creating Oklahoma Public and Private Facilities and Infrastructure Act. Effective date.
Title
Infrastructure development; creating Oklahoma Public and Private Facilities and Infrastructure Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 22 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sparks |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Montgomery (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB430 (Carry Over) 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017