OK SB424 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB424
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Vetoed 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Vetoed 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Discovery; requirements related to interrogatories, production of documents and requests for admissions. Effective date.
Title
Discovery; requirements related to interrogatories, production of documents and requests for admissions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed 05/15/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | Amended |
2017-04-12 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB424 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Vetoed 05/15/2017