OK SB421 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; modifying prohibited acts; modifying penalties. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; modifying prohibited acts; modifying penalties. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 4
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author)
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Young
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback