OK SB414 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: House General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; modifying composition of the Oklahoma Commission on the Status of Women; providing date by which members shall be appointed. Effective date.
Title
State government; modifying composition of the Oklahoma Commission on the Status of Women; providing date by which members shall be appointed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-03-27 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 20 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB414 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to General Government