OK SB414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Manslaughter; increasing statute of limitations for certain crimes. Effective date.
Title
Manslaughter; increasing statute of limitations for certain crimes. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB414 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)