OK SB412 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Violent crime; modifying inclusions as violent crimes. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Violent crime; modifying inclusions as violent crimes. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateApproved by Governor 06/05/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
2015-05-20SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2015-05-19SenateTitle restored
2015-05-19SenateCCR read, GCCA
2015-05-05HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2015-05-05SenateSCs named GCCA
2015-05-04SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-27SenateHAs read
2015-04-27HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-23HouseMotion expired
2015-04-21HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cleveland
2015-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
2015-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-08HouseTitle stricken
2015-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2015-03-25HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2015-03-25HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2015-03-03SenateTitle restored
2015-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-16Senatecoauthored by Biggs (principal House author)
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-02-05SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Brinkley
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
229882New CodeSee Bill Text
47111402New CodeSee Bill Text
575109New CodeSee Bill Text
7024101New CodeSee Bill Text
741502New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb412&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB412%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB412%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB412%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB412%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB412%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB412%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB412_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB412_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback