OK SB41 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB41
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State employee payroll deductions; modifying type of service company and minimum number of employees eligible for premium payments. Effective date.
Title
State employee payroll deductions; modifying type of service company and minimum number of employees eligible for premium payments. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2021-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Johns (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB41 (Carry Over) 2021-03-29 - CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee