OK SB400 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB400
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying population requirement for authorization of certain construction projects. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying population requirement for authorization of certain construction projects. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19 |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB400 (Carry Over) 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019