OK SB40 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
Pending: House Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
Pending: House Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Wildlife conservation; modifying requirements related to Wildlife Conservation Passport. Effective date.
Title
Wildlife conservation; modifying requirements related to Wildlife Conservation Passport. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Dorman (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ivester |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |