OK SB392 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB392

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School employees; prohibiting an employee from assisting another in obtaining a job under certain conditions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employees; prohibiting an employee from assisting another in obtaining a job under certain conditions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 18 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 25
2017-03-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author)
2017-02-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB392 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Measure failed: Ayes: 18 Nays: 25

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
706101Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback