OK SB383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
Pending: House Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
Pending: House Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing home administrators; requiring certain criminal background check; recognizing certain credential; extending licensure period. Effective date.
Title
Nursing home administrators; requiring certain criminal background check; recognizing certain credential; extending licensure period. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB383 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care