OK SB377 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; requiring the Board of Trustees to establish certain committee. Effective date.
Title
Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; requiring the Board of Trustees to establish certain committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15 | |
2011-05-09 | HAs adopted | |
2011-05-02 | HAs read | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 24 | |
2011-04-27 | Amended | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-03-31 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-03-01 | First Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 | |
2011-02-28 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-21 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) | |
2011-02-21 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 17 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |