OK SB375 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
Pending: House Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Horsemeat; repealing prohibition on human consumption of horsemeat. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horsemeat; repealing prohibition on human consumption of horsemeat. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2013-02-21HouseFirst Reading
2013-02-21SenateEngrossed to House
2013-02-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-02-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2013-02-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-02-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
2013-02-07Senatecoauthored by Enns (principal House author)
2013-02-07Senatecoauthored by Brecheen
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6311135Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311136Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311137Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311138Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6311139Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback