OK SB361 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher education; providing for the protection of certain expressive activities. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher education; providing for the protection of certain expressive activities. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 6 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved by Governor 04/29/2019
2019-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 26; Ayes: 6 Nays: 80
2019-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Tadlock, Lawson, Humphrey, Baker, West (Tammy), Luttrell, Patzkowsky, Sims, Burns, Hardin (David), McEntire, Newton, Smith, Marti
2019-04-22HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Strom
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) O'Donnell, Osburn, Martinez, Wright, McDugle, Mize, Miller, Olsen, Phillips, Strom, Townley, Frix, Sneed, Manger, Roberts (Dustin), Stark, Echols, Conley, Davis, West (Kevin), Hill, Sterling, Taylor, Sanders, Ortega, CrosswhiteHader, Caldwell (Chad), Gann, Pae, Kerbs, Boatman, Boles, Moore, McBride, Kiger, Russ, Fincher, Nollan, Roberts (Sean), Pfeiffer, Randleman, Steagall
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Rules
2019-04-02HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback