OK SB359 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Uninsured Vehicle Enforcement Program; automatic license plate reader systems; central database.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uninsured Vehicle Enforcement Program; automatic license plate reader systems; central database.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 32 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 27 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-04-18 - House - House: EXTEND DEBATE (Y: 23 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2016-04-18 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 45 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-27SenateSent to Governor
2016-05-27HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-27SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-27SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-27HouseTo Senate
2016-05-27HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 39; Ayes: 32 Nays: 30
2016-05-27HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-26HouseCCR submitted
2016-05-26SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
2016-05-26SenateCCR adopted
2016-05-25SenateEmergency clause restored
2016-05-25SenateTitle restored
2016-05-25SenateCCR read
2016-05-16Senatecoauthored by Jech
2016-04-28HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2016-04-27SenateSCs named Brooks, Brown, Jech, Quinn, Mazzei, Sparks, Bass
2016-04-25SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2016-04-21SenateHAs read
2016-04-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-20HouseMotion expired
2016-04-18HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Walker
2016-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 38
2016-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2016-04-07HouseRemove Representative Christian as principal House author and substitute with Representative Walker
2016-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-03-31HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2015-03-18HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2015-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-16HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-16SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2015-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2015-02-23Senatecoauthored by Christian (principal House author)
2015-02-12SenateEmergency clause stricken
2015-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Insurance committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Brooks
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
477606New CodeSee Bill Text
477623New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb359&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB359%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB359%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB359%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB359%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB359%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB359%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB359%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB359%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB359_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB359_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback