OK SB359 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Measure failed: Ayes: 3 Nays: 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Measure failed: Ayes: 3 Nays: 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
County legal notices; authorizing certain proceedings to be posted on county website. Codification.
Title
County legal notices; authorizing certain proceedings to be posted on county website. Codification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 3 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Measure failed: Ayes: 3 Nays: 43 | |
2011-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Remove as author Senator Newberry; authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2011-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Newberry | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 6 | 192 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 194 | New Code | See Bill Text |