OK SB357 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB357
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student loans; removing language regarding notification of certain licensing boards. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Student loans; removing language regarding notification of certain licensing boards. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 10; Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2017-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB357 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017