OK SB346 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Governor's Transparency Act of 2015. Effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Governor's Transparency Act of 2015. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: State Government Operations Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: State Government Operations Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Senate | Veto message read |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Vetoed 04/06/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-03-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-03-30 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-30 | House | General Order |
2015-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen |
2015-03-23 | House | CR; Do Pass State Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to State Government Operations |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Walker (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |