OK SB342 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; amending Local Development Act; modifying representation on certain committee and various procedures. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; amending Local Development Act; modifying representation on certain committee and various procedures. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
2015-05-20SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-19SenateTitle restored
2015-05-19SenateCCR read
2015-05-12HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Banking and Financial Services
2015-04-30SenateSCs named Standridge, Mazzei, Newberry, Fry, Brinkley, Floyd, Garrison
2015-04-29SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-27SenateHAs read
2015-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 21
2015-04-22HouseTitle stricken
2015-04-22HouseAmended
2015-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-07HouseEmergency removed
2015-04-07HouseTitle restored
2015-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Financial Services Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking and Financial Services
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12
2015-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2015-03-05Senatecoauthored by Russ (principal House author)
2015-02-17SenateEmergency clause stricken
2015-02-17SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-17SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb342&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB342%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB342%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB342%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB342%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB342%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB342%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB342%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB342%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB342_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB342_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback